WV HB3122 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 222, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 222, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to permit certain types of rifles using an encapsulated propellant charge that loads from the breech.
Title
Permitting certain types of rifles using an encapsulated propellant charge that loads from the breech
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 256) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 156) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 156) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Chapter 222, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-04 | House | Approved by Governor 3/4/2023 |
2023-03-06 | House | Approved by Governor 3/4/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/4/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-02-28 | House | To Governor 2/27/2023 - House Journal |
2023-02-27 | Senate | To Governor 2/27/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-02-27 | House | To Governor 2/27/2023 |
2023-02-23 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 256) |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2023-02-16 | Senate | To Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2023-02-16 | Senate | To Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-15 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 156) |
2023-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-15 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-14 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-02-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-13 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/14/23 |
2023-02-13 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-10 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-09 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2023-02-08 | House | To House Judiciary |
2023-02-08 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2023-01-27 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2023-01-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-27 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Judiciary |
2023-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |