WV HB3116 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of school curriculum teams and local school collaborative processes
Title
Relating to the authority of school curriculum teams and local school collaborative processes
Sponsors
Del. Timothy Ennis [D] | Del. Tiffany Lawrence [D] | Del. Ricky Moye [D] | Del. Amanda Pasdon [R] |
Del. David Perry [D] | Del. David Pethtel [D] | Del. Mary Poling [D] | Del. Stan Shaver [D] |
Del. Margaret Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-12 - House - Passage-senate Amended Hb (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - Passage (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - Passage (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-04 | Chapter 52, Acts, 2011 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 4/1/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 4/1/11 - House Journal | |
2011-04-01 | Approved by Governor 4/1/11 | |
2011-03-31 | To Governor 3/31/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/31/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/31/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-12 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-12 | House Message received | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-12 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 421) | |
2011-03-12 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-11 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2011-03-11 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 30) | |
2011-03-11 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-11 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 29) | |
2011-03-11 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-03-11 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-11 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-03-10 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-10 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-03-10 | On 1st reading | |
2011-03-10 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2011-03-10 | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Finance | |
2011-02-17 | To Education | |
2011-02-17 | To Education then Finance | |
2011-02-17 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-17 | House Message received | |
2011-02-16 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-02-16 | Passed House (Roll No. 97) | |
2011-02-16 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-16 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-15 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-15 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-14 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-14 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-02-11 | Do pass | |
2011-02-11 | Originating in House Education |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 5A | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |