WV HB3093 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 43, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 43, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require the same building code standards to be applied to manufactured housing as are applied to other housing.
Title
Relating to standards for factory-built homes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 316) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 315) (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 241) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 315) (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 241) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 43, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-08 | Senate | To Governor 3/8/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-08 | House | To Governor 3/8/19 |
2019-03-08 | House | To Governor 3/8/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-02 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 316) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 315) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-22 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-22 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-22 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 241) |
2019-02-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-12 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-12 | House | To Government Organization |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8A | 11 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |