WV HB3093 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 22, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to establish Broadband Enhancement and Expansion Policies. The bill moves the existing Broadband Enhancement Council into a new chapter, and sets forth additional duties and responsibilities for the council. The bill additionally authorizes the establishment of cooperative associations for the purpose of obtaining internet services. It also establishes new policies and protocols for microtrenching and make-ready pole access. Finally, it makes it an unfair and deceptive practice for an internet service provider to advertise or contract for “up to” speeds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing Broadband Enhancement and Expansion Policies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 538) (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 468) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 167) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23HouseChapter 22, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
2017-04-26HouseApproved by Governor 4/26/17
2017-04-09HouseApproved by Governor 4/26/17 - House Journal
2017-04-09SenateApproved by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal
2017-04-09SenateTo Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal
2017-04-09HouseTo Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal
2017-04-20HouseTo Governor 4/20/17
2017-04-08SenateHouse Message received
2017-04-08HouseCompleted legislative action
2017-04-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2017-04-08HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 538)
2017-04-08HouseHouse received Senate message
2017-04-07SenateSenate requests House to concur
2017-04-07SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 468)
2017-04-07SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-07SenateCommittee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote)
2017-04-07SenateAmendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2017-04-07SenateCommittee Amendment Reported
2017-04-07SenateOn 3rd reading with right to amend
2017-04-06SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-06SenateOn 2nd reading
2017-04-05SenateRead 1st time
2017-04-05SenateImmediate consideration
2017-04-05SenateReported do pass, with amendment
2017-03-27SenateTo Government Organization
2017-03-27SenateTo Government Organization
2017-03-27SenateIntroduced in Senate
2017-03-27SenateHouse Message received
2017-03-24HouseCommunicated to Senate
2017-03-24HousePassed House (Roll No. 167)
2017-03-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-03-24HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2017-03-23HouseRead 2nd time
2017-03-23HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2017-03-22HouseRead 1st time
2017-03-22HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2017-03-21HouseBy substitute, do pass
2017-03-14HouseTo House Judiciary
2017-03-14HouseIntroduced in House
2017-03-14HouseTo Judiciary
2017-03-14HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
126C11Amended CodeCitation Text
31158Amended CodeCitation Text
3115C1Repealed CodeCitation Text
3115C12Repealed CodeCitation Text
3115C13Repealed CodeCitation Text
3115C2Repealed CodeCitation Text
3115C3Repealed CodeCitation Text
3115C4Repealed CodeCitation Text
3115C5Repealed CodeCitation Text
3115C6Repealed CodeCitation Text
3115C7Repealed CodeCitation Text
3115C8Repealed CodeCitation Text
3115C9Repealed CodeCitation Text
31G11New CodeSee Bill Text
31G110New CodeSee Bill Text
31G111New CodeSee Bill Text
31G112New CodeSee Bill Text
31G113New CodeSee Bill Text
31G114Amended CodeCitation Text
31G12New CodeSee Bill Text
31G13New CodeSee Bill Text
31G14New CodeSee Bill Text
31G15New CodeSee Bill Text
31G16New CodeSee Bill Text
31G17New CodeSee Bill Text
31G18New CodeSee Bill Text
31G19New CodeSee Bill Text
31G21Amended CodeCitation Text
31G210Amended CodeCitation Text
31G211Amended CodeCitation Text
31G212Amended CodeCitation Text
31G213Amended CodeCitation Text
31G214Amended CodeCitation Text
31G215Amended CodeCitation Text
31G216Amended CodeCitation Text
31G217Amended CodeCitation Text
31G218Amended CodeCitation Text
31G219Amended CodeCitation Text
31G22Amended CodeCitation Text
31G220Amended CodeCitation Text
31G221Amended CodeCitation Text
31G222Amended CodeCitation Text
31G223Amended CodeCitation Text
31G224Amended CodeCitation Text
31G225Amended CodeCitation Text
31G226Amended CodeCitation Text
31G227Amended CodeCitation Text
31G228Amended CodeCitation Text
31G23Amended CodeCitation Text
31G24Amended CodeCitation Text
31G25Amended CodeCitation Text
31G26Amended CodeCitation Text
31G27Amended CodeCitation Text
31G28Amended CodeCitation Text
31G29Amended CodeCitation Text
31G31Amended CodeCitation Text
31G32Amended CodeCitation Text
31G41Amended CodeCitation Text
31G42Amended CodeCitation Text
31G43Amended CodeCitation Text
31G51Amended CodeCitation Text
31G52Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback