WV HB3091 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to change the due date for employers to file their annual reconciliation and withholding statements with the Tax Commissioner to January 31, which date is consistent with the date by which employers must file their annual employer withholding reconciliation statements with the Internal Revenue Service; and to require more employers to file W-2 information electronically with the Tax Commissioner. Additionally, obsolete language would be deleted from the current law.
Title
Relating generally to employer withholding taxes
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Nelson [R] | Del. Brent Boggs [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 240) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | To Finance |
2017-03-29 | Senate | To Finance |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-29 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 240) |
2017-03-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | Do pass |
2017-03-14 | House | To House Finance |
2017-03-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-14 | House | To Finance |
2017-03-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB593 (Similar To) 2017-03-13 - To Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 21 | 74 | Amended Code | Citation Text |