WV HB3089 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB3089
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide a transition to the county board of education level of the process for review and adoption of instructional resources required to be used in the schools under the jurisdiction of the county board.
Title
Relating to the adoption of instructional resources for use in the public schools
Sponsors
Del. Paul Espinosa [R] | Del. Joseph Statler [R] | Del. Joshua Higginbotham [R] | Del. Jill Upson [R] |
Del. Roy Cooper [R] | Del. Ruth Rowan [R] | Del. Jason Harshbarger [R] | Del. Mark Dean [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 148) (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Senate | To Education |
2017-03-24 | Senate | To Education |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-24 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-23 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 148) |
2017-03-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-23 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-22 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-03-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-20 | House | Do pass |
2017-03-14 | House | To House Education |
2017-03-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-14 | House | To Education |
2017-03-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3089 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - To Education