WV HB3069 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 209, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 209, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide that attorney fees may be awarded in certain workers’ compensation medical treatment claims. The bill provides that an attorney may be awarded $125 per hour up to $500 per medical issue. This is recommended by passage by the Access to Justice Commission of the West Virginia Supreme Court of Appeals.
Title
Relating to access to justice
Sponsors
Del. Tim Miley [D] | Del. Timothy Manchin [D] | Sen. Mark Hunt [D] | Del. Meshea Poore [D] |
Del. Isaac Sponaugle [D] | Del. Stephen Skinner [D] | Del. John Ellem [R] | Del. Patrick Lane [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 53) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Chapter 209, Acts, 2013 |
2013-05-01 | House | Approved by Governor 5/1/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 5/1/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/1/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 5/1/13 - House Journal |
2013-05-01 | House | To Governor 5/1/13 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 5/1/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-13 | House | House received Senate message |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 53) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-04-11 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2013-04-04 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-03 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 192) |
2013-04-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-01 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-03-29 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2013-03-26 | House | To House Finance |
2013-03-26 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2013-03-22 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-03-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-22 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2013-03-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB606 (Same As) 2013-03-22 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 5 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |