WV HB3061 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB3061
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to encourage a limited cohort of schools to implement mastery-based education through the Innovation In Education program. The initial cohort size is not more than twenty schools. The Department of Education is given a range of duties from the identification of barriers and potential solutions to developing an incubator process to support schools awarded an Innovation In Schools/Mastery-Based grant. The schools must meet the same requirements and accountability as other Innovation In Education schools.
Title
Encouraging mastery-based education through the Innovation In Schools program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 190) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | Senate | To Education |
2018-02-23 | Senate | To Education |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-23 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-22 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-22 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 190) |
2018-02-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-22 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-21 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-20 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-19 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-01-31 | House | To House Finance |
2018-01-31 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2018-01-10 | House | To House Education |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-10 | House | To Education |
2018-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3061 (Carry Over) 2017-04-08 - On 3rd reading