WV HB3048 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 97, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 97, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to increase the cap mandated on the collection of Tier II fees for chemical inventories.
Title
Relating to collection of Tier II fees for chemical inventories
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 505) (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 424) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 238) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 424) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 238) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Chapter 97, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/18/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-18 | House | To Governor 4/18/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/18/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 505) |
2017-04-07 | House | House concurred in Senate title amendment |
2017-04-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 424) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported do pass, with title amendment |
2017-03-29 | Senate | To Finance |
2017-03-29 | Senate | To Finance |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-29 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 238) |
2017-03-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-03-21 | House | To House Finance |
2017-03-21 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2017-03-14 | House | To House Government Organization |
2017-03-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-14 | House | To Government Organization then Finance |
2017-03-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB629 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - To Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 5A | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |