WV HB304 | 2021 | 3rd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-20 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-20 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making supplemental appropriation of federal funds to Division of Human Services Energy Assistance Fund
Title
Making supplemental appropriation of federal funds to Division of Human Services Energy Assistance Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-20 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2021-10-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2021-10-15 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-10-14 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 10/15/21 |
2021-10-14 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-10-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-10-13 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-10-12 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-10-12 | House | Immediate consideration |
2021-10-12 | House | Do pass |
2021-10-11 | House | To House Finance |
2021-10-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-10-11 | House | To Finance |
2021-10-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB3002 (Similar To) 2021-11-03 - Chapter 3, Acts, 3rd Extraordinary Session, 2021