WV HB3016 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 130, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 130, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to conform the statute to the actual duties of the State Aeronautics Commission. The commission administers grant programs to encourage and support needed capital improvements to the state's public airports. Airports meeting the criteria for Federal Aviation Administration Airport Improvement Program funds also qualify for funding from the state program. Currently, airports that meet the commission's criteria can qualify for up to half of the local share required to match FAA funds. The grant program is supported by the state tax on aircraft fuel and general revenue funds. The commission is not a law enforcement or regulatory agency, therefore, those sections which grant the commission law enforcement or regulatory authority are being repealed. The new language continues the commission and authorizes grant administration.
Title
Relating to the State Aeronautics Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 457) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 333) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 333) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 130, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 457) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 333) |
2019-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-18 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-18 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-02-12 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-12 | House | To Government Organization then Finance |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB562 (Similar To) 2019-02-08 - To Government Organization