WV HB3016 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-14 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-14 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating a meth offender registry
Title
Creating a meth offender registry
Sponsors
Del. Joe Ellington [R] | Del. Eric Householder [R] | Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] | Del. Christopher Stansbury [R] |
Del. Jordan Hill [R] | Del. Steve Westfall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-14 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2015-03-04 | House | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2015-03-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-02 | House | From Housel Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2015-03-02 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2015-02-27 | House | From Special Calendar, 1st reading, placed on House Calendar |
2015-02-25 | House | Do pass |
2015-02-25 | House | Originating in House Health and Human Resources |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 12A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 12A | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60A | 10 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60A | 10 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60A | 10 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |