WV HB3009 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the publication of county board financial statements
Title
Relating to the publication of county board financial statements
Sponsors
Del. Joe Ellington [R] | Del. Joshua Higginbotham [R] | Del. Christopher Toney [R] | Del. John Kelly [R] |
Del. Roger Conley [R] | Del. Dennis Kimes [R] | Del. Doug Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-10 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2021-03-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2021-03-23 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-19 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-03-09 | House | To House Education |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-09 | House | To Education |
2021-03-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 9 | 3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |