WV HB2981 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-09 - Chapter 92, Acts, 2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-09 - Chapter 92, Acts, 2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
This bill requires persons soliciting signatures for candidacy to provide a statement on every individual page of the certificate containing the dates of circulation and the signature of the person soliciting the signatures. The residency requirement is removed for persons soliciting signatures. This bill also allows any duly registered voter signing a certificate to vote for candidates of his or her choosing in the primary election. This bill provides deadlines for filing a certificate and payment of the filing fee.
Title
Relating to primary elections and nominating procedures of third-party candidates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-09 | Chapter 92, Acts, 2009 | |
2009-05-08 | Approved by Governor 5/8/09 | |
2009-05-26 | Approved by Governor 5/8/09 - House Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Approved by Governor 5/8/09 - Senate Journal | |
2009-05-26 | To Governor 5/5/09 - House Journal | |
2009-05-05 | To Governor 5/5/09 | |
2009-05-26 | To Governor 5/5/09 - Senate Journal | |
2009-04-11 | House Message received | |
2009-04-11 | Completed legislative action | |
2009-04-11 | Communicated to Senate | |
2009-04-11 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 477) | |
2009-04-11 | House received Senate message | |
2009-04-11 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2009-04-11 | Title amendment adopted | |
2009-04-11 | The bill still being in the possession of Senate | |
2009-04-11 | Senate requests return of bill from House | |
2009-04-11 | Motion | |
2009-04-11 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2009-04-11 | Title amendment withdrawn (Voice vote) | |
2009-04-11 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 27) | |
2009-04-11 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-11 | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) | |
2009-04-11 | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2009-04-11 | Committee Amendment Reported | |
2009-04-11 | Laid over on 3rd reading 4/10/09 | |
2009-04-11 | Rearranged on calendar by Rules Committee | |
2009-04-10 | Unanimous consent | |
2009-04-10 | Deferred until Foot bills on 2nd reading | |
2009-04-10 | Laid over on 3rd reading 4/9/09 | |
2009-04-09 | On 3rd reading with right to amend | |
2009-04-08 | Unanimous consent | |
2009-04-08 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-08 | On 2nd reading | |
2009-04-07 | Read 1st time | |
2009-04-07 | On 1st reading | |
2009-04-07 | Immediate consideration | |
2009-04-07 | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment | |
2009-04-02 | To Judiciary | |
2009-04-02 | To Judiciary | |
2009-04-02 | Introduced in Senate | |
2009-04-01 | Communicated to Senate | |
2009-04-01 | Passed House (Roll No. 237) | |
2009-04-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-01 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2009-03-31 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-03-31 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2009-03-30 | Read 1st time | |
2009-03-30 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2009-03-27 | Do pass | |
2009-03-06 | To House Judiciary | |
2009-03-06 | Introduced in House | |
2009-03-06 | To Judiciary | |
2009-03-06 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 5 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 5 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 5 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |