WV HB2976 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create the Economic Diversification Act of 2019 for the purpose of income tax relief to new businesses whose product or service offered is not currently offered in the state or to businesses that are already established in this state that are offering new products or services. Counties and municipalities may also offer tax relief. The bill requires the Secretary of Commerce to appoint a commission to determine eligibility. The bill limits the tax relief to a maximum period of eight years.
Title
Economic Diversification Act of 2019
Sponsors
Del. Daniel Linville [R] | Del. Joshua Higginbotham [R] | Del. Roger Hanshaw [R] | Del. Doug Skaff [D] |
Del. Geoff Foster [R] | Del. John Hardy [R] | Del. Zachery Maynard [R] | Sen. Eric Nelson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2019-02-26 | House | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-11 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-11 | House | To Finance |
2019-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |