WV HB2967 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 75, Acts, 2008
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 75, Acts, 2008
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create a program for veterans to share their experience in the military with public school children.
Title
Creating the "West Virginia Remembers Program"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-08 | Chapter 75, Acts, 2008 | |
2008-03-27 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/20/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/20/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-20 | To Governor 3/20/08 | |
2008-03-08 | House received Senate message | |
2008-03-08 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-08 | Communicated to House | |
2008-03-08 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 21) | |
2008-03-08 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-08 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-03-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-07 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-03-06 | Read 1st time | |
2008-03-06 | On 1st reading | |
2008-03-06 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-03-06 | Reported do pass | |
2008-02-26 | To Education | |
2008-02-26 | To Education | |
2008-02-26 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-25 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-25 | Passed House (Roll No. 137) | |
2008-02-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-25 | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 136) | |
2008-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-25 | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-02-25 | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar | |
2008-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-24 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-02-22 | By substitute, do pass | |
2008-01-09 | To House Education | |
2008-01-09 | Introduced in House | |
2008-01-09 | To Education | |
2008-01-09 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2967&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |