WV HB2949 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 164, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 164, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to exempt specified Division of Natural Resources’ contracts for some replacement, repair or design for repairs to facilities from review and approval requirements of the Division of Purchasing.
Title
Exempting specified Division of Natural Resources’ contracts for some replacement, repair or design for repairs to facilities from review and approval requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] | Del. Jeff Eldridge [D] | Del. Tony Lewis [R] | Del. George Ambler [R] |
Del. William Romine [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 387) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 182) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 182) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Chapter 164, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/21/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-21 | House | To Governor 4/21/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/21/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 387) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-04-01 | Senate | Laid over on 1st reading 4/1/17 |
2017-04-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2017-03-27 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-03-27 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 182) |
2017-03-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-03-15 | House | To House Government Organization |
2017-03-15 | House | Do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2017-03-13 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2017-03-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-13 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Government Organization |
2017-03-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 5 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |