WV HB2882 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2882
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to repealing a ban on construction of nuclear power plants
Title
Relating to repealing a ban on construction of nuclear power plants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2022-01-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2022-01-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-01-26 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-25 | House | Do pass |
2022-01-21 | House | To House Government Organization |
2022-01-21 | House | Do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2022-01-12 | House | To House Energy and Manufacturing |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-12 | House | To Energy and Manufacturing then Government Organization |
2022-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2882 (Carry Over) 2021-03-03 - To House Energy and Manufacturing
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 27A | 1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
16 | 27A | 2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |