WV HB2837 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 179, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 179, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to amend various provisions of the Code affecting the Treasurer's Office. In addition to various technical clean up revisions, the bill authorizes organizations exempt from taxation within West Virginia to participate in the deferred compensation plan Retirement Plus in accordance with the Internal Revenue Code and authorizes Roth accounts within the deferred compensation plan Retirement Plus in accordance with the Internal Revenue Code. Financial institutions would be permitted to offer products in addition to certificates of deposit. The bill updates references to investing authorities to include the Board of Treasury Investments, raises the amount of eligible deposits from $100,000 to the amount insured by a federal agency, deletes archaic language pertaining to eligible depositories, amends language pertaining to what constitutes a conflict of interest for applicants and employees of the Treasurer's office in connection with financial institutions by prohibiting those persons with a defined conflict from participating in the selection of or in contract negotiations with a depository, and authorizes depositories to submit reports in an electronic format. In connection with the Cash Management Improvement Act (CMIA), the bill repeals duplicate
Title
Amending various provisions of the Code affecting the Treasurer's Office
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 444) (Y: 59 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 114) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 40) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 178) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 114) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 40) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 178) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Chapter 179, Acts, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 5/2/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/2/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/2/2013 |
2013-04-29 | House | To Governor 4/29/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/29/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 4/29/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-13 | House | House received Senate message |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 114) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 444) |
2013-04-13 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2013-04-13 | House | Deferred |
2013-04-13 | House | House received Senate message |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 40) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-04-11 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2013-04-04 | Senate | To Finance |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-03 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 178) |
2013-04-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-03 | House | On 3rd reading with restricted right to amend, Special Calender |
2013-04-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-01 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-03-29 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2013-03-14 | House | To House Finance |
2013-03-14 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2013-03-06 | House | To House Pensions and Retirement |
2013-03-06 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-06 | House | To Pensions and Retirement then Finance |
2013-03-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB432 (Same As) 2013-03-11 - To Finance