WV HB2827 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 137, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 137, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to amend this statute to make public charter schools eligible for Safe Schools Funds; provide that Safe Schools Funds shall be distributed providing that Safe Schools Funds shall be distributed first to meet the special education video requirements, then safe school entry way needs, and when met, on the basis of need; provide that any moneys distributed from the Safe Schools Fund for facility improvements shall only be expended on facilities owned by a county board of education, public charter school or multicounty vocational center, unless the improvements to such facilities may be removed with minimal effort; and, provide that the West Virginia Board of Education shall promulgate rules to govern the process by which county boards of education, public charter schools and multicounty vocational centers may apply for needs-based funding from the Safe Schools Fund.
Title
Make public charter schools eligible for Safe Schools Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 381) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 211) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 211) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Chapter 137, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-29 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-16 | House | To Governor 3/16/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/16/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 381) |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-03 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2023-02-24 | Senate | To Education |
2023-02-24 | Senate | To Education |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-23 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 211) |
2023-02-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-23 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-22 | House | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2023-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2023-02-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2023-02-21 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-20 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-17 | House | Do pass |
2023-01-24 | House | To House Finance |
2023-01-24 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2023-01-19 | House | To House Education |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-19 | House | To Education then Finance |
2023-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 5 | 48 | Amended Code | Citation Text |