WV HB2820 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 136, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 136, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow participants in the Hope Scholarship Program and in Microschools and Learning Pods to access to athletic programs.
Title
To provide HOPE Scholarship recipients with the ability to play sports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 765) (Y: 64 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-03-11 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 764) (Y: 63 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 445) (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 171) (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-11 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 764) (Y: 63 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 445) (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 171) (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Chapter 136, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Became law without Governor's signature - Senate Journal |
2023-03-11 | House | Became law without Governor's signature- House Journal |
2023-03-29 | House | Became law 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | To Governor 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/22/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-11 | House | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-11 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 765) |
2023-03-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 764) |
2023-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 445) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Rules committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Rucker amendments to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Rules Committee Amendment Reported |
2023-03-08 | Senate | School Choice committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Deferred until foot of 1st reading |
2023-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Rules on 2nd reading |
2023-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-24 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments |
2023-02-17 | Senate | To School Choice |
2023-02-17 | Senate | To School Choice |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-16 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-16 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 171) |
2023-02-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-16 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-15 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-14 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-14 | House | Immediate consideration |
2023-02-14 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2023-01-19 | House | To House Education |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-19 | House | To Education |
2023-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 2 | 25E | New Code | See Bill Text |