WV HB2802 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - On 2nd reading to Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - On 2nd reading to Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to prohibit use of turning lanes for through traffic under certain circumstances.
Title
Prohibiting use of turning lanes for through traffic under certain circumstances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-28 - House - Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | On 2nd reading to Judiciary | |
2011-03-07 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-07 | On 1st reading | |
2011-03-01 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-03-01 | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Judiciary | |
2011-03-01 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2011-03-01 | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Judiciary | |
2011-03-01 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-03-01 | House Message received | |
2011-02-28 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-02-28 | Passed House (Roll No. 155) | |
2011-02-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-28 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-25 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-24 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-02-23 | By substitute, do pass | |
2011-02-10 | To House Judiciary | |
2011-02-10 | Do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2011-01-24 | To House Roads and Transportation | |
2011-01-24 | Introduced in House | |
2011-01-24 | To Roads and Transportation then Judiciary | |
2011-01-24 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 7 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |