WV HB2789 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-08 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-08 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to exempt certain services from the certificate of need.
Title
Removing birthing centers from certificate of need
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 84) (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 83) (Y: 73 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 83) (Y: 73 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-08 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-08 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-07 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 84) |
2023-02-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 83) |
2023-02-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-06 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/7/23 |
2023-02-06 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-02 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-01 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2023-01-18 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-18 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-01-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 2D | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 2D | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 2D | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |