WV HB2776 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-04 - Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-04 - Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to increase certain filing fees in certain civil actions. The bill establishes new filing fees in certain civil actions. The bill requires that those new and increased fees be deposited in the existing Fund for Civil Legal Services for Low-Income Persons. The bill also provides that a portion be retained by the clerks office.
Title
Increasing certain filing fees in certain civil actions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-02 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-04-01 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2013-03-28 | House | To House Finance |
2013-03-28 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2013-03-01 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-01 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2013-03-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB581 (Similar To) 2013-03-20 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | 1 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |