WV HB2748 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-21 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-21 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow community voting locations and shortening the time period for in-person early voting.
Title
Relating to the voting period for early in-person voting
Sponsors
Del. Doug Skaff [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-21 | To House Judiciary | |
2011-01-21 | Introduced in House | |
2011-01-21 | To Judiciary | |
2011-01-21 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB391 (Similar To) 2011-03-12 - Effective Date
SB450 (Similar To) 2011-02-07 - To Judiciary
SB367 (Similar To) 2011-02-01 - To Judiciary
SB450 (Similar To) 2011-02-07 - To Judiciary
SB367 (Similar To) 2011-02-01 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 3 | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 3 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |