WV HB2741 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to expansion of the alcohol test and lock program to offenders with a drug related offense
Title
Relating to expansion of the alcohol test and lock program to offenders with a drug related offense
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-10 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2021-03-05 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2021-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-03 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-03 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-02 | House | Do pass |
2021-02-24 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-24 | House | To Judiciary |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB345 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Chapter 266, Acts, Regular Session, 2021