WV HB2726 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 7, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 7, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify choice of laws issues in product's liability actions.
Title
Clarifying choice of laws issues in product's liability actions
Sponsors
Del. John Shott [R] | Del. Michael Folk [R] | Del. John Overington [R] | Del. Kelli Sobonya [R] |
Sen. Mike Azinger [R] | Del. Frank Deem [R] | Del. Terry Waxman [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2015 (Roll No. 3) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - Effective July 1, 2015 (Roll No. 282) (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 281) (Y: 84 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 13) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 123) (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - Effective July 1, 2015 (Roll No. 282) (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 281) (Y: 84 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 13) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 123) (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Chapter 7, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 4/2/15 - House Journal |
2015-04-02 | House | Approved by Governor 4/2/15 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/2/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 4/1/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 4/1/15 - House Journal |
2015-04-01 | House | To Governor 4/1/15 |
2015-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2015 (Roll No. 3) |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House effective date |
2015-03-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-03 | House | Effective July 1, 2015 (Roll No. 282) |
2015-03-03 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 281) |
2015-03-03 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-01 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2015-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 13) |
2015-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-02-28 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-02-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-28 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-27 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2015-02-23 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-02-23 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-02-23 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-02-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 123) |
2015-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-20 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-19 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-18 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-18 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-17 | House | Do pass |
2015-02-13 | House | To House Judiciary |
2015-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-13 | House | To Judiciary |
2015-02-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 8 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |