WV HB2724 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 104, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 104, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish a community-based pilot project to promote public health through comprehensive community development in communities across West Virginia, and to support this project through the Herbert Henderson Office of Inclusion (formerly the Herbert Henderson Office of Minority Affairs).
Title
Relating to creating a pilot program under the Herbert Henderson Office of Minority Affairs
Sponsors
Del. Tim Armstead [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 461) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 174) (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 174) (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Chapter 104, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/24/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/24/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-24 | House | Approved by Governor 4/24/17 |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-20 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 461) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-04-05 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2017-03-31 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2017-03-27 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2017-03-27 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Government Organization |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 174) |
2017-03-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-03-08 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2017-03-08 | House | Do pass, but first to Health and Human Resources |
2017-02-27 | House | To House Political Subdivisions |
2017-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-27 | House | To Political Subdivisions then Health and Human Resources |
2017-02-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB425 (Similar To) 2017-02-23 - To Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 26 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 26 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 26 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 26 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |