WV HB2716 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-14 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-14 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to increase funding amounts at which charitable organizations are required to provide a professional audit or financial review, and to clarify filing requirements.
Title
Relating to charitable organizations
Sponsors
Del. Joshua Nelson [R] | Del. Linda Longstreth [D] | Del. Michael Ferro [D] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] |
Del. Linda Phillips [D] | Del. Nancy Peoples Guthrie [D] | Del. John O'Neal [R] | Sen. Eric Nelson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-14 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2015-03-02 | House | From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2015-03-02 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-27 | House | Laid over on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/28/15 |
2015-02-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-26 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-25 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2015-02-12 | House | To House Finance |
2015-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-12 | House | To Finance |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB351 (Same As) 2015-04-15 - Chapter 44, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 19 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |