WV HB2705 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Health and Human Resources to promulgate a legislative rule relating to food establishments
Title
Authorizing the Department of Health and Human Resources to promulgate a legislative rule relating to food establishments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 156) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-16 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 156) |
2021-03-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-15 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-11 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-10 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-02-23 | House | To House Government Organization |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-23 | House | To Government Organization |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |