WV HB2675 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - House rejected (Roll No. 341)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - House rejected (Roll No. 341)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to costs and interest in eminent domain condemnation proceedings
Title
Relating to the interest rate for condemnation cases and creating conformity with statutory rates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House rejected (Roll No. 341) (Y: 9 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | House rejected (Roll No. 341) |
2021-03-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-30 | House | Placed at foot of bills on third reading |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2021-03-30 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-30 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2021-03-30 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2021-03-05 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2021-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-03 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-03 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-02 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-02-23 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-23 | House | To Judiciary |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB400 (Similar To) 2021-02-23 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 2 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
54 | 2 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
54 | 2 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
54 | 2 | 14a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
54 | 2 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
54 | 2 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
54 | 2 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
54 | 2 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |