WV HB2675 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-08 - Senate requests House to concur
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-08 - Senate requests House to concur
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to designate the placement of nonpartisan judicial offices on the primary election ballot.
Title
Relating to primary elections and nominating procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 502) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 81) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 81) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 502) |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2017-03-11 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-11 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 81) |
2017-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2017-03-08 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-08 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2017-03-07 | House | Do pass |
2017-02-22 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-22 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-02-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 5 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 5 | 13a | Amended Code | Citation Text |