WV HB2662 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 238, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 238, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the automatic termination of a service personnel employment contract and the automatic revocation of a bus driver’s certificate if the employee or bus driver are convicted of certain crimes
Title
Relating to certificates or employment of school personnel
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 439) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 316) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 316) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 238, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/21/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 439) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate reconsidered amendment |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments and title amendment |
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Education |
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Education |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 316) |
2019-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-24 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-24 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2019-01-24 | House | Originating in House Education |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18A | 2 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18A | 4 | 8e | Amended Code | Citation Text |