WV HB2636 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 115, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 115, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to protect the privacy of concealed weapon permit holders. The bill provides that information relating to applications for concealed weapon permits is exempt from the Freedom of Information Act. The bill further provides that information collected in the application process for a concealed weapon permit is confidential and provides criminal penalties for violations.
Title
Exempting information contained in a concealed weapon permit application from the Freedom of Information Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-14 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 624) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 19) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 358) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 19) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 358) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Chapter 115, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/1/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-04-01 | House | Approved by Governor 4/1/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 4/1/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/18/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/18/15 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-14 | House | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 624) |
2015-03-14 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 19) |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-14 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Deferred until foot of 2nd reading |
2015-03-13 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2015-03-05 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-03-05 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-03-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 358) |
2015-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-02 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-28 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2015-02-06 | House | To House Judiciary |
2015-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-06 | House | To Judiciary |
2015-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB275 (Same As) 2015-01-21 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29B | 1 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29B | 1 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29B | 1 | 3a | New Code | See Bill Text |
29B | 1 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |