WV HB2628 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Senate requests House to concur
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Senate requests House to concur
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changing the date of filing announcements of candidacies
Title
Changing the date of filing announcements of candidacies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 21) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 192) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 192) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 21) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2015-02-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-02-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-02-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 192) |
2015-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-20 | House | Do pass |
2015-02-05 | House | To House Judiciary |
2015-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-05 | House | To Judiciary |
2015-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 5 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |