WV HB2620 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - On 1st reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - On 1st reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a departmental study of the child protective services and foster care workforce
Title
Relating to a departmental study of the child protective services and foster care workforce
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-10 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2021-02-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2021-02-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-24 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-02-19 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-19 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB391 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - To House Health and Human Resources