WV HB2608 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 48, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 48, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to repeal requiring printing the date a consumer deposit account was opened on paper checks.
Title
Repealing the requirement of printing the date a consumer deposit account was opened on paper checks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 302) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 301) (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 95) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 301) (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 95) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 48, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Approved by Governor 3/19/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/19/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/19/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-08 | Senate | To Governor 3/8/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-08 | House | To Governor 3/8/19 |
2019-03-08 | House | To Governor 3/8/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-02 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 302) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 301) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-08 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2019-02-08 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 95) |
2019-02-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-04 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2019-02-04 | House | Do pass |
2019-01-23 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-23 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 3 | 39l | Repealed Code | Citation Text |