WV HB2598 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2598
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - To Energy, Industry, and Mining
Pending: Senate Energy, Industry and Mining Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - To Energy, Industry, and Mining
Pending: Senate Energy, Industry and Mining Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Altering the definition of an above ground storage tank
Title
Modifying the inspection requirements and the definition of an above ground storage tank
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 132) (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | To Energy, Industry, and Mining |
2022-02-16 | Senate | To Energy, Industry, and Mining |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-15 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 132) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-15 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-14 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-02-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-11 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-10 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2022-02-10 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-01-12 | House | To House Energy and Manufacturing |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-12 | House | To Energy and Manufacturing then Health and Human Resources |
2022-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2598 (Carry Over) 2021-03-12 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 30 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 30 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 30 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |