WV HB2590 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 38, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 38, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating a public nonprofit corporation and governmental instrumentality to collectively address several environmental and economic development programs
Title
Creating a public nonprofit corporation and governmental instrumentality to collectively address several environmental and economic development programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 421) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 23) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 72) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 23) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 72) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Chapter 38, Acts, 2013 |
2013-04-29 | House | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/29/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-29 | House | To Governor 4/29/13 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 4/29/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-13 | House | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 421) |
2013-04-13 | House | House received Senate message |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 23) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-04-11 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2013-03-27 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-03-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-03-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 72) |
2013-03-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-03-25 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-03-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-03-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-03-22 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-03-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2013-03-14 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-03-14 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2013-02-21 | House | To House Energy, Industry and Labor, Economic Development and Small Business |
2013-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-02-21 | House | To Energy, Industry and Labor, Economic Development and Small Business then Judiciary |
2013-02-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31 | 21 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 21 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 21 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 21 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 21 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 21 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 21 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 21 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 21 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 21 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 21 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 21 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 21 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 21 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 21 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 21 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 21 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 21 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 21 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 21 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 21 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |