WV HB2585 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 57, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 57, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create criminal offenses relating to money laundering. The bill specifies two new felonies relating to: (i) Laundering criminal proceeds through financial transaction; and (ii) transportation, transmission, or transfer of criminal proceeds. The bill also provides for the forfeiture of proceeds involved or traceable to the laundering.
Title
Creating felony crime of conducting financial transactions involving proceeds of criminal activity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-08 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 527) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 589) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 401) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 31) (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 589) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 401) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 31) (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Chapter 57, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/21/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-21 | House | To Governor 4/21/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/21/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 527) |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-08 | House | House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 589) |
2017-04-08 | House | Conference report received-House |
2017-04-08 | House | Conference report filed - House |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Conference report filed - Senate |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-08 | House | To conference |
2017-04-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-08 | House | House appointed conferees: Sobonya, Hollen, Miller, R. |
2017-04-08 | House | House agreed to conference |
2017-04-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Senate appoints conference committee: Weld, Maynard, Jeffries |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Senate refused to recede; requested conference (Voice vote) |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-07 | House | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) |
2017-04-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 401) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2017-03-01 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-01 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 31) |
2017-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2017-02-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-02-27 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2017-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2017-02-23 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-02-21 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-21 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-02-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 14 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 14 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 14 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 14 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 14 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 15 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 15 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 15 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 15 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |