WV HB2552 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-19 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-19 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to except magistrates and municipal court judges from the requirement of having a license to carry a concealed weapon.
Title
Providing an exception to magistrates and municipal court judges from the requirement of having a license to carry a concealed weapon
Sponsors
Del. Randal Swartzmiller [D] | Del. Ronnie Jones [D] | Del. Erikka Storch [R] | Del. Phillip Diserio [D] |
Del. Michael Ferro [D] | Del. Brent Boggs [D] | Sen. Ryan Ferns [R] | Del. Daniel Poling [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - House - House amd. & repassed to meet the obj. of the Governor (Roll No. 474) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 454) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 10) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 148) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 454) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 10) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 148) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-02-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-02-19 | House | To Judiciary |
2013-02-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 7 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 7 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |