WV HB2536 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to expressions of legislative intent regarding equivalent instruction time

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to expressions of legislative intent regarding equivalent instruction time

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-10HouseOn 2nd reading, House Calendar
2021-02-17HousePlaced on House Calendar
2021-02-17HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-02-16HouseRead 1st time
2021-02-16HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2021-02-15HouseDo pass
2021-02-15HouseOriginating in House Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18545aNew CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback