WV HB2500 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 73, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 73, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish statewide uniformity for auxiliary container regulations.
Title
Create an act for Statewide Uniformity for Auxiliary Container Regulations
Sponsors
Del. Geoff Foster [R] | Del. Mark Dean [R] | Del. Brandon Steele [R] | Del. John Mandt [R] |
Del. Joe Jeffries [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 644) (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 469) (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 469) (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 51) (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 469) (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 469) (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 51) (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 73, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/19/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-19 | House | Approved by Governor 4/19/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/19/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-14 | House | To Governor 4/14/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | To Governor 4/14/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/14/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-10 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 644) |
2021-04-10 | House | House concurred in Senate effective date (Voice) |
2021-04-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur in changed effective date |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 469) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 469) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Amendment not germane |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 4/9/21 with right to amend |
2021-04-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-04-07 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2021-02-24 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2021-02-24 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-02-23 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 51) |
2021-02-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-23 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-18 | House | Do pass |
2021-02-15 | House | To House Government Organization |
2021-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-15 | House | To Government Organization |
2021-02-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 63 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 63 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 63 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |