WV HB2500 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-08 - On 1st reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-08 - On 1st reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this supplemental appropriation bill is to supplement, amend, and increase items of appropriation in the aforesaid account for the designated spending unit for expenditure during the fiscal year 2017.
Title
Supplementary appropriation to the Department of Health and Human Resources, Division of Human Services
Sponsors
Del. Tim Armstead [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-08 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2017-03-13 | House | From Special Calendar, 1st reading, placed on House Calendar |
2017-03-09 | House | Do pass |
2017-02-16 | House | To House Finance |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-16 | House | To Finance |
2017-02-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB302 (Similar To) 2017-05-23 - Chapter 16, Acts, Regular Session, 2017