WV HB2493 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 146, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 146, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to prohibit insurance policies and contracts providing accident and sickness insurance or direct health care services that cover anti-cancer medications from charging higher copayments, deductibles or coinsurance for orally administered anti-cancer medications than is required for anti-cancer medications administered by injection or intravenously. Certain acts to comply with the requirements are prohibited; The requirements apply to policies or contracts that are issued or renewed after January 1, 2016. The bill also allows for cost containment measures if the cost of compliance exceeds two per cent of the total cost of coverage.
Title
Relating to requirements for insurance policies and contracts providing accident and sickness insurance or direct health care services that cover anti-cancer medications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 14) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 180) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 180) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Chapter 146, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/18/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/18/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-13 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 14) |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-02-25 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2015-02-25 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-02-25 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-02-24 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-02-24 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 180) |
2015-02-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-24 | House | On 3rd reading with restricted right to amend, Special Calender |
2015-02-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-23 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-20 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-19 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2015-01-30 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2015-01-30 | House | Do pass, but first to Health and Human Resources |
2015-01-28 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-01-28 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Health and Human Resources |
2015-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 15 | 4l | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 16 | 3x | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 24 | 7m | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 25 | 8j | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 25A | 8l | New Code | See Bill Text |