WV HB2492 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 141, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 141, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to direct all reports of abuse and neglect to the central office of DHHR via communications method established by the department.
Title
Relating to mandatory reporting procedures of abuse and neglect of adults and children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 212) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 123) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 45) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 123) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 45) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 141, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | House | Approved by Governor 2/28/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/28/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-28 | House | Approved by Governor 2/28/19 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | To Governor 2/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-22 | House | To Governor 2/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-22 | House | To Governor 2/22/19 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-19 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-02-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 212) |
2019-02-19 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 123) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2019-01-31 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-31 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-31 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-01-30 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-01-30 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 45) |
2019-01-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-30 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-29 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-25 | House | Do pass |
2019-01-17 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-17 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 2 | 809 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 6 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |