WV HB2492 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 56, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 56, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to repeal the requirement that an entity charging admission to view certain closed circuit telecast or subscription television events needs to obtain a permit from the State Athletic Commission and report certain information.
Title
Repealing the requirement that an entity charging admission to view certain closed circuit telecast or subscription television events needs to obtain a permit from the State Athletic Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 24) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 118) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 118) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Chapter 56, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 4/2/15 - House Journal |
2015-04-02 | House | Approved by Governor 4/2/15 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/2/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-04-01 | House | To Governor 4/1/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 4/1/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 4/1/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-14 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 24) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2015-02-23 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2015-02-23 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-02-23 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-02-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 118) |
2015-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-20 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-19 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-18 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-18 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-17 | House | Do pass |
2015-01-28 | House | To House Government Organization |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-01-28 | House | To Government Organization |
2015-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 5A | 10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |