WV HB2483 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2483
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 49, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 49, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Division of Juvenile Services to transfer to a correctional facility or regional jail any juvenile in its custody that has been transferred to adult jurisdiction of the circuit court and who reaches his or her eighteenth birthday
Title
Requiring the Division of Juvenile Services to transfer to a correctional facility or regional jail any juvenile in its custody that has been transferred to adult jurisdiction of the circuit court and who reaches his or her eighteenth birthday
Sponsors
Del. Jeff Eldridge [D] | Del. Jim Butler [R] | Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] | Del. Rodney Miller [D] |
Del. Kelli Sobonya [R] | Del. Richard Iaquinta [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 324) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 277) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 19) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 277) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 19) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Chapter 49, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/20/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-20 | House | Approved by Governor 3/20/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/20/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/9/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/9/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/9/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-05 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 324) |
2018-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 277) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2018-01-29 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-01-29 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-29 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-01-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-01-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 19) |
2018-01-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-01-26 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-25 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-01-24 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-23 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-01-10 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-10 | House | To Judiciary |
2018-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2483 (Carry Over) 2017-03-30 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 4 | 720 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 4 | 722 | Amended Code | Citation Text |