WV HB2470 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 172, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 172, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide a sign support specialist or an educational sign language interpreter in the education of exceptional children. It also deals with school service personnel, service personnel classification, compensation and duties. The bill specifies employment duties for certain positions, modifies certain service personnel classification titles, establishes certain service personnel classification titles and sets their wages. The bill also establishes conditions for employer payment of and continuing education credit accrual for certain certification acquisition.
Title
Relating to sign support specialist or an educational sign language interpreter in the education of exceptional children
Sponsors
Del. Mary Poling [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 11) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 11) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 151) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 150) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 11) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 151) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 150) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Chapter 172, Acts, 2013 |
2013-04-30 | House | Approved by Governor 4/30/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 4/30/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/30/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-29 | House | To Governor 4/29/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/29/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 4/29/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-13 | House | House received Senate message |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 11) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 11) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Having been read 1st time, prior proceedings, 4/9/13 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Finance |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-04-09 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2013-04-04 | Senate | To Education |
2013-04-04 | Senate | To Education then Finance |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-03 | House | Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 151) |
2013-04-03 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 150) |
2013-04-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-02 | House | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-04-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-01 | House | Immediate consideration |
2013-04-01 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2013-03-28 | House | To House Finance |
2013-03-28 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2013-02-14 | House | To House Education |
2013-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-02-14 | House | To Education then Finance |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 20 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18A | 2 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18A | 4 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18A | 4 | 8a | Amended Code | Citation Text |