WV HB2412 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to consolidate criminal offenses relating to government procurement into one article within the Chapter 61, the crimes chapter, of the West Virginia Code, to establish definitions common to all offenses, and to clarify who is subject to these prohibitions. This bill has been recommended for introduction and passage by the Commission on Special Investigations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to criminal acts concerning government procurement of commodities and services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 657) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 432) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 19) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseVetoed by Governor 3/27/19
2019-03-09HouseVetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateVetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/21/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-21HouseTo Governor 3/21/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/21/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-08HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-08HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 657)
2019-03-08HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-08SenateSenate requests House to concur
2019-03-08SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 432)
2019-03-08SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-08SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-03-07SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-07SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-03-06SenateRead 1st time
2019-03-06SenateOn 1st reading
2019-03-05SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2019-01-25SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-25SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-25SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-25SenateHouse Message received
2019-01-24HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-01-24HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-01-24HousePassed House (Roll No. 19)
2019-01-24HouseRead 3rd time
2019-01-24HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-23HouseRead 2nd time
2019-01-23HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-22HouseRead 1st time
2019-01-22HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-21HouseDo pass
2019-01-15HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced in House
2019-01-15HouseTo Judiciary
2019-01-15HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB271 (Similar To) 2019-01-18 - To Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5A328Repealed CodeCitation Text
5A330Repealed CodeCitation Text
5A331Repealed CodeCitation Text
615B1New CodeSee Bill Text
615B2New CodeSee Bill Text
615B3New CodeSee Bill Text
615B4New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback